NY S02193 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-22 - VETOED MEMO.131
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that an accusatory instrument or supporting deposition consisting of factual allegations by a deponent with limited English proficiency is not sufficient unless accompanied by a sworn statement from an interpreter affirming the accuracy of the English interpretation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that an accusatory instrument or supporting deposition consisting of factual allegations by a deponent with limited English proficiency is not sufficient unless accompanied by a sworn statement from an interpreter affirming the accuracy of the English interpretation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-22SenateVETOED MEMO.131
2023-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-06-21Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-06-21Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-05Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.482
2023-06-05Assemblysubstituted for a129
2023-05-17Assemblyreferred to codes
2023-05-17SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-05-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-15SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.834
2023-01-31SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2023-01-19SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A00129 (Same As) 2023-06-05 - substituted by s2193

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback