NY S02172 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to a judicial diversion program for certain felony offenders; expands definition for an eligible defendant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to a judicial diversion program for certain felony offenders; expands definition for an eligible defendant.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-02-07SenatePRINT NUMBER 2172A
2019-02-07SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE
2019-01-23SenateREFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE

Same As/Similar To

A01510 (Same As) 2019-04-09 - reported

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback