NY S02171 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to re-defining the term physically helpless to mean an individual who is physically unable to communicate affirmative consent through words or clear actions that offer permission and a willingness to engage in sexual activity.
Title
Relates to re-defining the term physically helpless to mean an individual who is physically unable to communicate affirmative consent through words or clear actions that offer permission and a willingness to engage in sexual activity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.977 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A01408 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to codes