NY S02168 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the New York state health care quality and cost containment commission to issue a report considering the impact on health insurance costs and quality of legislation requiring coverage of long term and chronic Lyme disease and other tick-borne diseases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the New York state health care quality and cost containment commission to issue a report considering the impact on health insurance costs and quality of legislation requiring coverage of long term and chronic Lyme disease and other tick-borne diseases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26Assemblyreferred to insurance
2018-03-26SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-03-26SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-03-05SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2168A
2018-01-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-01-23Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-01-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.227
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-05-15Assemblyreferred to insurance
2017-05-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-05-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-05-09SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.804
2017-05-09SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-01-12SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE

Same As/Similar To

A04863 (Same As) 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback