NY S02165 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the location of presiding judge at arraignment, appearance proceedings and pursuant to a warrant.
Title
Relates to the location of presiding judge at arraignment, appearance proceedings and pursuant to a warrant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.192 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2017-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.289 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A08195 (Same As) 2018-04-25 - enacting clause stricken