NY S02165 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8657
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8657
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates police officers of the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs as peace officers.
Title
Designates police officers of the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs as peace officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8657 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1146 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2011-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A08657 (Same As) 2012-12-17 - tabled