NY S02158 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-30 - PRINT NUMBER 2158A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-30 - PRINT NUMBER 2158A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a tax credit in the amount of certain fees charged in connection with loans under the federal home loan guarantee program to national guard and reserve veterans.
Title
Provides a tax credit in the amount of certain fees charged in connection with loans under the federal home loan guarantee program to national guard and reserve veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2158A |
2012-03-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2011-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01196 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - held for consideration in ways and means