NY S02157 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - signed chap.449
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - signed chap.449
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the Sawkill Creek in Ulster county within the definition of "inland waterways" for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Includes the Sawkill Creek in Ulster county within the definition of "inland waterways" for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Senate | signed chap.449 |
2019-10-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.284 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2157 |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-05-20 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-16 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.331 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-12 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-06 | Senate | print number 2225a |
2019-02-06 | Senate | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2019-01-22 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-05-29 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2225A |
2019-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.284 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A02225 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - signed chap.449