NY S02154 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - VETOED MEMO.184
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to creating a hotline for the reporting of various forms of abuse which may jeopardize the health or welfare of any person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to creating a hotline for the reporting of various forms of abuse which may jeopardize the health or welfare of any person.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-29AssemblyVETOED MEMO.184
2017-11-17SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-15Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-15Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-15Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.356
2017-06-15Assemblysubstituted for a8160
2017-06-13Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1537
2017-06-12SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-05-18SenatePRINT NUMBER 2154A
2017-05-18SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2017-02-14SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2017-01-12SenateREFERRED TO AGING

Same As/Similar To

A08160 (Same As) 2017-06-15 - substituted by s2154a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02154&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02154&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02154
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02154&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02154A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S2154#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S2154#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S2154#SF1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02154&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback