NY S02152 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to waivers for families of victims of terrorist attacks.
Title
Relates to waivers for families of victims of terrorist attacks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2026 |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1226 |
2015-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A02026 (Same As) 2015-10-05 - signed chap.361