NY S02142 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the disclosure of lead-based paint test reports in real estate transactions.
Title
Requires the disclosure of lead-based paint test reports in real estate transactions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-02-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.448 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2142A |
2021-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.999 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A06608 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.220