NY S02138 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - VETOED MEMO.189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - VETOED MEMO.189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes coverage of treatment rendered by a massage therapist.
Title
Includes coverage of treatment rendered by a massage therapist.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-30 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.189 |
2022-12-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.214 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | substituted for a8930 |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2022-02-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-02-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.79 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2021-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A08930 (Same As) 2022-05-16 - substituted by s2138