NY S02133 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.82
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.82
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a surcharge to the fee paid for issuing or reissuing a real estate broker or salesmen license with such surcharge being collected by the department of state and payable to the office of the attorney general, to be used for statewide fair housing testing efforts.
Title
Adds a surcharge to the fee paid for issuing or reissuing a real estate broker or salesmen license with such surcharge being collected by the department of state and payable to the office of the attorney general, to be used for statewide fair housing testing efforts.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] |
Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.82 |
2021-12-21 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.698 |
2021-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.320 |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a5363 |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-02-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-03 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2133A |
2021-02-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.231 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A05363 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - substituted by s2133a