NY S02128 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of infant walkers and restricts the use of such infant walkers in certain settings.
Title
Prohibits the sale of infant walkers and restricts the use of such infant walkers in certain settings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-10-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2128C |
2019-10-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-05-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2128B |
2019-05-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-03-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2128A |
2019-03-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00624 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - advanced to third reading cal.352