NY S02128 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 2128A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 2128A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the venison donation tax credit.
Title
Establishes the venison donation tax credit.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Thomas Croci [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] | Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. James Seward [R] |
Sen. David Valesky [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2128A |
2018-02-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-05-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00497 (Same As) 2018-02-12 - print number 497a