NY S02127 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-05 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an indirect source review for heavy distribution warehouse operations; requires the department of environmental conservation to conduct a study regarding zero-emissions zones.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes an indirect source review for heavy distribution warehouse operations; requires the department of environmental conservation to conduct a study regarding zero-emissions zones.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-05Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2024-06-05SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-06-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-06-05SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1755
2024-06-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2024-05-24SenatePRINT NUMBER 2127C
2024-05-24SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2024-05-21SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2024-05-09SenatePRINT NUMBER 2127B
2024-05-09SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2023-11-15SenatePRINT NUMBER 2127A
2023-11-15SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2023-01-18SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A01718 (Same As) 2024-05-31 - print number 1718c

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S2127
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02127&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02127
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02127&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02127A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02127&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02127B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02127&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02127C
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S2127#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S2127#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S2127#SC2

Bill Comments

feedback