NY S02127 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides relief on statewide central registrar clearance fees for tax exempt organizations and that the fee of twenty-five dollars shall not apply to tax-exempt not-for-profit child care providers registered as a federal 501 c(3) charitable organization.
Title
Provides relief on statewide central registrar clearance fees for tax exempt organizations and that the fee of twenty-five dollars shall not apply to tax-exempt not-for-profit child care providers registered as a federal 501 c(3) charitable organization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2017-03-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A02161 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to children and families