NY S02122 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1841A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1841A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to payments in lieu of taxes; improves how payments in lieu of taxes are collected.
Title
Relates to payments in lieu of taxes; improves how payments in lieu of taxes are collected.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1841A |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1105 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2122A |
2017-05-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A01841 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - tabled