NY S02121 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits persons or business entities from filing unnecessary personal identifying information with an agency; provides for enforcement by the attorney general.
Title
Prohibits persons or business entities from filing unnecessary personal identifying information with an agency; provides for enforcement by the attorney general.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.218 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A03349 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION