NY S02115 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to re-defining the term physically helpless to mean an individual who is physically unable to communicate affirmative consent through words or clear actions that offer permission and a willingness to engage in sexual activity.
Title
Relates to re-defining the term physically helpless to mean an individual who is physically unable to communicate affirmative consent through words or clear actions that offer permission and a willingness to engage in sexual activity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2022-04-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-04-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.369 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-03-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.308 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A02315 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to codes