NY S02115 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New York state commission on establishing a bank owned by New York state for purposes of determining what benefits a public bank or network of public banks owned by the state of New York or by a public authority constituted by the state of New York could provide for the New York State government, local governments, communities, private businesses, community banks, credit unions and people; requires publication of the commission's findings and recommendations.
Title
Establishes the New York state commission on establishing a bank owned by New York state for purposes of determining what benefits a public bank or network of public banks owned by the state of New York or by a public authority constituted by the state of New York could provide for the New York State government, local governments, communities, private businesses, community banks, credit unions and people; requires publication of the commission's findings and recommendations.
Sponsors
Sen. James Sanders [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Julia Salazar [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2115B |
2019-04-29 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2115A |
2019-03-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.337 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06522 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means