NY S02114 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and directs the commissioner of education to conduct a study on the number of children who are caregivers and how being a caregiver impacts their education.
Title
Authorizes and directs the commissioner of education to conduct a study on the number of children who are caregivers and how being a caregiver impacts their education.
Sponsors
Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Samra Brouk [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Assembly | referred to education |
2022-02-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-02-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.69 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | referred to education |
2021-02-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.244 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05849 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to education