NY S02105 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to modifying delinquent mortgage loans and single point of contact.
Title
Relates to modifying delinquent mortgage loans and single point of contact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.592 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2019-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1156 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A07513 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - ordered to third reading rules cal.305