NY S02099 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits state or local police from accepting military surplus equipment from the federal government.
Title
Prohibits state or local police from accepting military surplus equipment from the federal government.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.513 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A05419 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to governmental operations