NY S02099 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that subpoenas issued relating to election matters be served with a separate informational sheet that summarizes why the subpoena has been issued.
Title
Requires that subpoenas issued relating to election matters be served with a separate informational sheet that summarizes why the subpoena has been issued.
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO ELECTIONS |
2020-02-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2099A |
2020-02-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |