NY S02096 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - PRINT NUMBER 2096D
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - PRINT NUMBER 2096D
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "New York's Own combat veterans healthcare choice program act" to establish tax free savings accounts to pay the healthcare costs of combat veterans on active duty during Operation Enduring Freedom or Operation Iraqi Freedom, until covered by the federal government; and directs the division of military and naval affairs to establish a registry of Afghanistan and Iraq veterans.
Title
Establishes the "New York's Own combat veterans healthcare choice program act" to establish tax free savings accounts to pay the healthcare costs of combat veterans on active duty during Operation Enduring Freedom or Operation Iraqi Freedom, until covered by the federal government; and directs the division of military and naval affairs to establish a registry of Afghanistan and Iraq veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2096D |
2018-01-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2017-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2096C |
2017-06-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-05-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2096B |
2017-05-02 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-04-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2096A |
2017-04-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-03-27 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A08298 (Same As) 2018-01-31 - print number 8298b