NY S02093 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the village of Endicott to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to Police Officer Jennifer Quinn who is employed by such village.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the village of Endicott to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to Police Officer Jennifer Quinn who is employed by such village.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-05SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1180
2019-06-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-01-22SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A05391 (Same As) 2019-02-11 - referred to governmental employees

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback