NY S02091 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a valid government issued photo identification card be presented when casting a ballot; provides for persons eligible for Medicaid to receive identification cards.
Title
Requires a valid government issued photo identification card be presented when casting a ballot; provides for persons eligible for Medicaid to receive identification cards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-04-03 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2019-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |