NY S02091 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-23 - SIGNED CHAP.233
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-23 - SIGNED CHAP.233
Summary
Relates to child care assistance eligibility; provides that applicants shall be encouraged to obtain a child support order but no applicant for, or recipient of, child care assistance shall be required to pursue a court order for child support as a condition of eligibility for child care assistance.
Title
Relates to child care assistance eligibility; provides that applicants shall be encouraged to obtain a child support order but no applicant for, or recipient of, child care assistance shall be required to pursue a court order for child support as a condition of eligibility for child care assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-23 | SIGNED CHAP.233 | |
2009-07-13 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2009-06-16 | returned to senate | |
2009-06-15 | passed assembly | |
2009-05-18 | ordered to third reading cal.564 | |
2009-05-18 | substituted for a3657 | |
2009-03-11 | referred to social services | |
2009-03-10 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-03-10 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-03-05 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-03-04 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-03-03 | 1ST REPORT CAL.74 | |
2009-02-11 | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A03657 (Same As) 2009-07-23 - SIGNED CHAP.233
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02091&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |