NY S02088 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Makes rent stabilized dwelling units eligible for certain protections regarding deposits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes rent stabilized dwelling units eligible for certain protections regarding deposits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-20Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2024-03-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-03-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-02-26SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-02-14Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-02-13Senate1ST REPORT CAL.427
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-03-31Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2023-03-31SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-03-31SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-03-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-03-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-02-28Senate1ST REPORT CAL.408
2023-01-18SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A03025 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to judiciary

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback