NY S02076 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2574
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2574
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the automatic voter registration process; amends certain voter registration processes and the agencies to be included as designated agencies.
Title
Relates to the automatic voter registration process; amends certain voter registration processes and the agencies to be included as designated agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2574 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.139 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A02574 (Same As) 2021-02-16 - signed chap.37