NY S02074 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - SIGNED CHAP.86
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - SIGNED CHAP.86
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to written notice requirements for mass layoffs; includes a requirement to notify each locality which provides police, firefighting, emergency medical or ambulance services to the site of employment at which the mass layoff will occur.
Title
Relates to written notice requirements for mass layoffs; includes a requirement to notify each locality which provides police, firefighting, emergency medical or ambulance services to the site of employment at which the mass layoff will occur.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.86 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.122 |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | substituted for a1919 |
2021-02-02 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2021-02-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.137 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A01919 (Same As) 2021-03-08 - substituted by s2074