NY S02069 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.224
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.224
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the promotion, market and sale of New York state farm products for holiday celebrations and decorations.
Title
Relates to the promotion, market and sale of New York state farm products for holiday celebrations and decorations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.224 |
2020-09-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.226 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | substituted for a4153 |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-03-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.269 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2019-02-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.98 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A04153 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.224