NY S02067 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - PRINT NUMBER 2067B
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes school districts to establish an insurance reserve fund in an amount and manner determined by a qualified and independent actuary certified by the American Academy of Actuaries to be reasonable and necessary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes school districts to establish an insurance reserve fund in an amount and manner determined by a qualified and independent actuary certified by the American Academy of Actuaries to be reasonable and necessary.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenatePRINT NUMBER 2067B
2019-05-17SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2019-02-05SenatePRINT NUMBER 2067A
2019-02-05SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2019-01-22SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A00114 (Same As) 2019-05-31 - print number 114a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback