NY S02056 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing the terms of office of members of the legislature to four years and prohibiting legislators from receiving outside income from active employment.
Title
Relates to increasing the terms of office of members of the legislature to four years and prohibiting legislators from receiving outside income from active employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-12 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-02-10 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-01-13 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |