NY S02056 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-05 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-05 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Nissequogue River state park.
Title
Establishes the Nissequogue River state park.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2016-05-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.613 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2015-03-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-03-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.142 |
2015-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04979 (Same As) 2016-05-05 - held for consideration in tourism, parks, arts and sports development