NY S02052 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "Joanne's law"; requires notification of actions of perpetrator of crime in workplace to the workplace.
Title
Enacts "Joanne's law"; requires notification of actions of perpetrator of crime in workplace to the workplace.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.231 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2017-03-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.152 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |