NY S02047 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the number of senators and the apportionment of senate districts; provides that each senate district shall be comprised of one county in its entirety.
Title
Relates to the number of senators and the apportionment of senate districts; provides that each senate district shall be comprised of one county in its entirety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2020-03-13 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-02-14 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-02-27 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-02-07 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A06461 (Same As) 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in governmental operations