NY S02044 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.281
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.281
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing angling by a single individual with up to three lines in freshwater; extends effectiveness of provisions for two years.
Title
Relates to authorizing angling by a single individual with up to three lines in freshwater; extends effectiveness of provisions for two years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.281 |
2021-07-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.263 |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | substituted for a6305 |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2021-04-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.242 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06305 (Same As) 2021-05-05 - substituted by s2044