NY S02044 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.203
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the department of agriculture and markets making available information concerning minimum guidelines for vegetation management plans in a manner that is pollinator friendly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the department of agriculture and markets making available information concerning minimum guidelines for vegetation management plans in a manner that is pollinator friendly.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-29AssemblySIGNED CHAP.203
2019-08-23SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-03-06Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-03-06Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-06Assemblyordered to third reading cal.85
2019-03-06Assemblysubstituted for a5312
2019-01-28Assemblyreferred to agriculture
2019-01-28SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-01-28SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-01-22SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.46
2019-01-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A05312 (Same As) 2019-03-06 - substituted by s2044

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback