NY S02041 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-28 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires public notice prior to certain transportation facility closures; provides an exception for unforeseen circumstances where closure is necessary to ensure public health, safety and welfare.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires public notice prior to certain transportation facility closures; provides an exception for unforeseen circumstances where closure is necessary to ensure public health, safety and welfare.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-28Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2019-01-28SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-01-28SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-01-22SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.43
2019-01-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A02688 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - reported referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback