NY S02038 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-10 - SIGNED CHAP.616
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-10 - SIGNED CHAP.616
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the information which must be included on applications for absentee ballots for school district elections.
Title
Relates to the information which must be included on applications for absentee ballots for school district elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-10 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.616 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.327 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a1922a |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-04-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-08 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2038A |
2019-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.127 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01922 (Same As) 2019-12-10 - SIGNED CHAP.616