NY S02037 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the sale of tonic water, bitters and maraschino cherries at liquor stores.
Title
Relates to the sale of tonic water, bitters and maraschino cherries at liquor stores.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.810 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A04317 (Same As) 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken