NY S02025 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain registered pharmacy technicians to assist a licensed pharmacist in preparing prescriptions in facilities licensed pursuant to articles twenty-eight or thirty-one of the public health law, or a pharmacy owned and operated by such facility, under the direct supervision of a licensed pharmacist employed by such facility.
Title
Permits certain registered pharmacy technicians to assist a licensed pharmacist in preparing prescriptions in facilities licensed pursuant to articles twenty-eight or thirty-one of the public health law, or a pharmacy owned and operated by such facility, under the direct supervision of a licensed pharmacist employed by such facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2022-05-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-10 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2025B |
2022-05-03 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2025A |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.874 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2021-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1622 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01090 (Same As) 2022-05-18 - print number 1090b