NY S02022 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of health to make publicly available the results of all inspections conducted by the department in nursing homes and other residential health care facilities in the state during the COVID-19 state disaster emergency.
Title
Directs the department of health to make publicly available the results of all inspections conducted by the department in nursing homes and other residential health care facilities in the state during the COVID-19 state disaster emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Samra Brouk [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1034 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2022A |
2021-03-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2021-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A01010 (Same As) 2022-01-12 - REFERRED TO HEALTH