NY S01997 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - PRINT NUMBER 1997A
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "standing is tiring (sit) act"; requires employers to provide suitable seats to all employees where the nature of such employees' work reasonably permits seated work; prohibits employers from artificially designing a work space to require standing; requires the department of labor to determine whether the nature of work reasonably permits seated work; creates a private right of action for employees whose employer does not provide seats.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "standing is tiring (sit) act"; requires employers to provide suitable seats to all employees where the nature of such employees' work reasonably permits seated work; prohibits employers from artificially designing a work space to require standing; requires the department of labor to determine whether the nature of work reasonably permits seated work; creates a private right of action for employees whose employer does not provide seats.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-18SenatePRINT NUMBER 1997A
2024-04-18SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO LABOR
2023-01-18SenateREFERRED TO LABOR

Same As/Similar To

A05642 (Same As) 2024-04-24 - print number 5642a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback