NY S01996 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to residency requirements for members of municipal departments of sanitation; removes the five years of service residency issue.
Title
Relates to residency requirements for members of municipal departments of sanitation; removes the five years of service residency issue.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2016-02-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-02-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-01-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-01-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.46 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-03-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-03-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.148 |
2015-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01779 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to governmental operations