NY S01992 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 1992A
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes certain changes applicable to the foreclosure of reverse mortgages, made by chapter 55 of the laws of 2017, take effect immediately and continue past the expiration of certain provisions of law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes certain changes applicable to the foreclosure of reverse mortgages, made by chapter 55 of the laws of 2017, take effect immediately and continue past the expiration of certain provisions of law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-26SenatePRINT NUMBER 1992A
2018-01-26SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
2017-01-11SenateREFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT

Same As/Similar To

A01266 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.85
A09592 (Same As) 2018-01-25 - referred to judiciary

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback