NY S01988 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - PRINT NUMBER 1988A
Pending: Senate Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - PRINT NUMBER 1988A
Pending: Senate Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to determinations of appropriate educational programs for certain students in a school district in a city having a population of one million or more.
Title
Relates to determinations of appropriate educational programs for certain students in a school district in a city having a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1988A |
2022-03-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO DISABILITIES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
2021-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A03795 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - print number 3795a