NY S01979 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on November 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-11-22 - VETOED MEMO.50
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Empire State Development Corporation, in consultation with the department of agriculture and markets and the office of new Americans to conduct a study on the economic impact of the establishment of kitchen incubators; requires a report to the governor and the legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the Empire State Development Corporation, in consultation with the department of agriculture and markets and the office of new Americans to conduct a study on the economic impact of the establishment of kitchen incubators; requires a report to the governor and the legislature.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-11-22SenateVETOED MEMO.50
2024-11-15SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2024-05-23Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-05-23Assemblypassed assembly
2024-05-23Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.102
2024-05-23Assemblysubstituted for a6321a
2024-05-22Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2024-05-22SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-05-22SenateREPASSED SENATE
2024-04-11SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1979A
2024-04-11SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2024-04-11Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-04-11SenateRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2024-02-26Assemblyreferred to economic development
2024-02-26SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-02-26SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-01-23SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-01-22Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-01-17Senate1ST REPORT CAL.148
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-03-21Assemblyreferred to higher education
2023-03-21SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-03-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-01-31SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-01-30Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-01-25Senate1ST REPORT CAL.211
2023-01-17SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS

Same As/Similar To

A06321 (Same As) 2024-05-23 - substituted by s1979a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S1979
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01979&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01979
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01979&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01979A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S1979#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S1979#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S1979#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S1979#SF2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S1979#SF3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01979&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback